TX HB1560 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1780 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - Amended RV#585 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#559 (Y: 18 N: 124 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 See remarks for effective date
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-30SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30HouseRecord vote RV#1780
2021-05-30HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2021-05-30HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-28HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-28SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-28SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2021-05-27SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-27SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-27SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-27HouseHouse requests conference committee
2021-05-27HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2021-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-24HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateAmended
2021-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#585
2021-04-30HousePassed as amended
2021-04-30HouseAmended 1-Goldman
2021-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-29HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#559
2021-04-29HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Slaton
2021-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-29HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCorrected committee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCorrected comm. report distributed
2021-04-22HouseCorrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
2021-04-21HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-31HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-31HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24HouseWithdrawn from schedule
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-03-11HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB714 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects

AUCTIONS & AUCTIONEERS
AUDIOLOGISTS
BARBERING & COSMETOLOGY ADVISORY BOARD
BARBERS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
COSMETOLOGISTS
DRIVER EDUCATION & SAFETY CLASSES
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
GREYHOUND RACING
HORSE RACING
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
POLYGRAPH EXAMINATIONS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
RACING ADVISORY BOARD, TEXAS
RACING COMMISSION, TEXAS
REAL ESTATE COMMISSION
SPEECH-LANGUAGE PATHOLOGISTS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Sunset—Required Reviews
TELECONFERENCING
TOWING & STORAGE ADVISORY BOARD
VIDEOCONFERENCING

Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1560
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01560I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01560H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01560E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01560S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01560F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01560H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01560H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01560S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01560I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01560H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01560H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01560E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01560E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01560S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01560S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01560F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1560&RcdVtNo=559&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1560&RcdVtNo=585&Ch=H&Dt=04/30/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1560&RcdVtNo=1780&Ch=H&Dt=05/30/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=34

Bill Comments

feedback