TX HB1560 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the removal of an obsolete reference regarding open-enrollment charter schools and the State Board of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the removal of an obsolete reference regarding open-enrollment charter schools and the State Board of Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Education
2017-05-08SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-27HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HousePassed
2017-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-09HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-09HouseRead first time
2017-02-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback