TX HB1554 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to disclosure of a beneficiary to a funeral director under a life insurance policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to disclosure of a beneficiary to a funeral director under a life insurance policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#597 (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Read 2nd time RV#567 (Y: 119 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2023-05-01SenateRead first time
2023-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2023-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2023-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-04-27HouseRecord vote RV#597
2023-04-27HousePassed
2023-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2023-04-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-04-26HouseRecord vote RV#567
2023-04-26HousePassed to engrossment
2023-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2023-04-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2023-04-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-03-28HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-03-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-03HouseReferred to Insurance
2023-03-03HouseRead first time
2023-01-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback