TX HB1550 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Postponed 6/3/21 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HousePostponed 6/3/21 10:00 AM
2021-05-12HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-11HousePostponed 5/12/21 11:00 AM
2021-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-15HouseCorrected committee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-14HouseCorrected comm. report distributed
2021-04-14HouseCorrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-03-11HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB711 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback