TX HB155 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-03 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-03 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of an appraisal review board to direct changes in the appraisal roll and related appraisal records if a residence homestead is sold for less than the appraised value.
Title
Relating to the authority of an appraisal review board to direct changes in the appraisal roll and related appraisal records if a residence homestead is sold for less than the appraised value.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#47 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#42 (Y: 107 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#42 (Y: 107 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-08-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-08-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-08-03 | House | Passed |
2017-08-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-08-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-08-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-08-02 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2017-08-02 | House | Amended |
2017-08-02 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2017-08-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-08-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-08-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-07-31 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-07-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-07-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-07-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-07-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-14 | House | Filed |