TX HB1549 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of services by the Department of Family and Protective Services, including child protective services and prevention and early intervention services.
Title
Relating to the provision of services by the Department of Family and Protective Services, including child protective services and prevention and early intervention services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2010 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#966 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#868 (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2010 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#966 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#868 (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-25 | House | House requests conference committee |
2017-05-25 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2017-05-05 | House | Amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AUTOPSIES
CHILD ABUSE
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
Governor
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
PREVENTION ADVISORY BOARD
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
CHILD ABUSE
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
Governor
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
PREVENTION ADVISORY BOARD
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF