TX HB1544 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility of land to continue to be appraised for ad valorem tax purposes as qualified open-space land if the land is temporarily used for sand mining operations; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility of land to continue to be appraised for ad valorem tax purposes as qualified open-space land if the land is temporarily used for sand mining operations; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1265 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#166 (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Vetoed by the Governor
2021-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-20SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1265
2021-05-20HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-14HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-14HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-14HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-14SenateRecord vote
2021-05-14SenatePassed
2021-05-14SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-14SenateRecord vote
2021-05-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-14SenateRecord vote
2021-05-14SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-14SenateRecord vote
2021-05-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-14SenateReferred to Finance
2021-04-14SenateRead first time
2021-04-13SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-13HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-13HouseRecord vote RV#166
2021-04-13HousePassed
2021-04-13HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-12HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-12HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-30HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-08HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2021-03-08HouseRead first time
2021-02-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1544
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01544I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01544E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01544S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01544F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01544I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01544H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01544E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01544E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01544S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01544S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01544F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1544&RcdVtNo=166&Ch=H&Dt=04/13/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-14-F.PDF#page=13
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-14-F.PDF#page=14
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1544&RcdVtNo=1265&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2021

Bill Comments

feedback