TX HB1540 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to regulation of certain facilities and establishments with respect to, civil remedies for certain criminal activities affecting, and certain criminal offenses involving health, safety, and welfare; creating a criminal offense; increasing criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to regulation of certain facilities and establishments with respect to, civil remedies for certain criminal activities affecting, and certain criminal offenses involving health, safety, and welfare; creating a criminal offense; increasing criminal penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1572 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#191 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1572
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-25SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-20SenateRecord vote
2021-05-20SenatePassed
2021-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-20SenateRecord vote
2021-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20SenateAmended
2021-05-20SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Taylor
2021-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20SenateAmended
2021-05-20SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Alvarado
2021-05-20SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-04-19SenateRead first time
2021-04-14SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-14HouseRecord vote RV#191
2021-04-14HousePassed
2021-04-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-13HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-08HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-08HouseRead first time
2021-03-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1036 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1540
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01540I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01540H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01540E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01540S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01540F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01540S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01540S2F2.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01540I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01540H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01540E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01540E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01540S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01540S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01540F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1540&RcdVtNo=191&Ch=H&Dt=04/14/2021
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-20-F.PDF#page=42
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1540&RcdVtNo=1572&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback