TX HB1540 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Funeral Service Commission; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Funeral Service Commission; authorizing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#442 (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amendment tabled RV#417 (Y: 115 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amendment tabled RV#416 (Y: 110 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23 See remarks for effective date
2019-05-23 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-10HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-10HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-07SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-07SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-02SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-04-24SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#442
2019-04-17HousePassed
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#417
2019-04-16HouseAmendment tabled 2-Cain
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#416
2019-04-16HouseAmendment tabled 1-Cain
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB620 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1540
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01540I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01540H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01540E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01540S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01540F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1540&RcdVtNo=416&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1540&RcdVtNo=417&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1540&RcdVtNo=442&Ch=H&Dt=04/17/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-10-F.PDF#page=9

Bill Comments

feedback