TX HB1537 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Postponed 6/1/23 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Postponed 6/1/23 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the submission by law enforcement agencies to certain public school personnel of a handle with care notice concerning a traumatic event experienced by a public school student and to certain required training regarding those notices.
Title
Relating to the submission by law enforcement agencies to certain public school personnel of a handle with care notice concerning a traumatic event experienced by a public school student and to certain required training regarding those notices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Postponed 6/1/23 10:00 AM |
2023-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select |
2023-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMMISSION ON LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Electronic Information Systems
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Electronic Information Systems
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety