TX HB1530 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing the issuance of revenue bonds to fund capital projects at public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing the issuance of revenue bonds to fund capital projects at public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1096 (Y: 121 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - RV#1095 (Y: 115 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Higher Education
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1096
2021-05-14HousePassed as amended
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1095
2021-05-14HouseAmended 1-J.D. Johnson
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-13HouseAmended 4-Craddick
2021-05-13HouseAmendment adopted as amended 2-Burns
2021-05-13HouseAmendment amended 3-Burns
2021-05-13HouseAmendment(s) offered 2-Burns, Slawson, Talarico, Price, Darby, Smithee, Deshotel, Buckley, Goldman, Kacal, White, More
2021-05-13HouseAmended 1-Murphy
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Higher Education
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1530
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01530I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01530H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01530E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01530H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01530H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01530H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01530H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01530H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01530I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01530H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01530H.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1530&RcdVtNo=1095&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1530&RcdVtNo=1096&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback