TX HB1528 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain procedures applicable to certain offenses involving family violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain procedures applicable to certain offenses involving family violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1709 (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#843 (Y: 100 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-22HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1709
2019-05-22HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-16HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-16HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateAmended
2019-05-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-15SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-01HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-01HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-01HouseRecord vote RV#843
2019-05-01HousePassed
2019-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB693 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback