TX HB1527 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the relationship between dentists and certain employee benefit plans and health insurers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the relationship between dentists and certain employee benefit plans and health insurers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#2075 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#681 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-18 Effective on 9/1/23
2023-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2023-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2023-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2023-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2023-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2023-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#2075
2023-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2023-05-19HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2023-05-19HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2023-05-19HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2023-05-18SenateRecord vote
2023-05-18SenatePassed
2023-05-18SenateRead 3rd time
2023-05-18SenateRecord vote
2023-05-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2023-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-05-18SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2023-05-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2023-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2023-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2023-05-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2023-05-11SenateVote taken in committee
2023-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-05-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2023-05-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2023-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-05-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2023-05-01SenateRead first time
2023-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2023-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2023-04-28HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-04-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-04-28HouseRecord vote RV#681
2023-04-28HousePassed
2023-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2023-04-28HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-04-28HousePassed to engrossment
2023-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2023-04-28HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2023-04-25HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2023-04-20HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2023-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2023-04-11HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2023-04-11HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2023-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2023-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-03-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-03HouseReferred to Insurance
2023-03-03HouseRead first time
2023-01-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1981 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB1981 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB1527
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB01527I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB01527H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB01527E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB01527S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB01527F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01527I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01527H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB01527H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01527E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB01527E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01527S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB01527S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01527A.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01527F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB1527&RcdVtNo=681&Ch=H&Dt=04/28/2023
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ05-18-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ05-18-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB1527&RcdVtNo=2075&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2023

Bill Comments

feedback