TX HB1522 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the transfer of Midwestern State University to the Texas Tech University System, to certain fees charged by that system's governing board, and to mandatory venue for actions brought against that system or its institutions, officers, or employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the transfer of Midwestern State University to the Texas Tech University System, to certain fees charged by that system's governing board, and to mandatory venue for actions brought against that system or its institutions, officers, or employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#193 (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-08 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenatePassed
2021-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-12SenateMeeting cancelled
2021-05-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Higher Education
2021-04-19SenateRead first time
2021-04-14SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-14HouseRecord vote RV#193
2021-04-14HousePassed
2021-04-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-13HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-13HouseAmended 1-Frank
2021-04-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-08HouseReferred to Higher Education
2021-03-08HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB447 (Same As) 2021-05-18 - Not again placed on intent calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1522
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01522I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01522H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01522E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01522S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01522F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01522H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01522I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01522H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01522H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01522E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01522E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1522&RcdVtNo=193&Ch=H&Dt=04/14/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=21

Bill Comments 750

feedback