TX HB1520 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain extraordinary costs incurred by certain gas utilities relating to Winter Storm Uri and a study of measures to mitigate similar future costs; providing authority to issue bonds and impose fees and assessments.
Title
Relating to certain extraordinary costs incurred by certain gas utilities relating to Winter Storm Uri and a study of measures to mitigate similar future costs; providing authority to issue bonds and impose fees and assessments.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Rep. Eddie Morales [D] |
Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1703 (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - FA2 Kolkhorst (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#325 (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - FA2 Kolkhorst (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#325 (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1703 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Kolkhorst |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hancock |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-20 | House | Record vote RV#325 |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-19 | House | Amended 1-Paddie |
2021-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1579 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB1579 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB1579 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
BONDS
DEBT
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
RAILROAD COMMISSION
SECRETARY OF STATE
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas
DEBT
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
RAILROAD COMMISSION
SECRETARY OF STATE
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas