TX HB1518 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of the sale of dextromethorphan to minors; providing civil penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of the sale of dextromethorphan to minors; providing civil penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-17 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-06 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-06SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-06HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-05HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-03HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenatePassed
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-03SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-24SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-24SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-04-16SenateRead first time
2019-04-15SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-12HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-12HouseRecord vote RV#320
2019-04-12HousePassed
2019-04-12HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-12HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-12HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-12HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-01HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-03-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-25HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB349 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback