TX HB1518 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the addition of territory to and the amount of production fees imposed by the Trinity Glen Rose Groundwater Conservation District.
Title
Relating to the addition of territory to and the amount of production fees imposed by the Trinity Glen Rose Groundwater Conservation District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-26 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-24 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2009-03-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time | |
2009-02-20 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2009-02-19 | Filed |
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
TRINITY GLEN ROSE GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
TRINITY GLEN ROSE GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT