TX HB1517 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the hours for the sale and consumption of alcoholic beverages at certain licensed or permitted premises during special events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the hours for the sale and consumption of alcoholic beverages at certain licensed or permitted premises during special events.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-08HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-03-08HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback