TX HB1517 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a notification requirement if a public school, including an open-enrollment charter school, does not have a nurse assigned to the school during all instructional hours.
Title
Relating to a notification requirement if a public school, including an open-enrollment charter school, does not have a nurse assigned to the school during all instructional hours.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#972 (Y: 83 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#972 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
PARENTAL NOTIFICATION
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
PARENTAL NOTIFICATION