TX HB1516 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to efficiency audits of the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program and the state temporary assistance and support services program.
Title
Relating to efficiency audits of the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program and the state temporary assistance and support services program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1122 (Y: 94 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1122 (Y: 94 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1122 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-13 | House | Postponed 5/13/21 8:30PM |
2021-05-13 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB657 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
AUDITOR, STATE
AUDITS & AUDITORS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Human Services--General
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
AUDITS & AUDITORS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Human Services--General
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD