TX HB1514 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas Olive Oil Industry Advisory Board.
Title
Relating to the Texas Olive Oil Industry Advisory Board.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Buckley [R] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] | Rep. Charles Anderson [R] |
Rep. John Cyrier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-04-15 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 743 |
2019-04-08 | House | Postponed 4/15/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB743 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Agriculture
AGRICULTURE, COMMISSIONER OF
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
OLIVE OIL INDUSTRY ADVISORY BOARD, TEXAS
TEXAS A&M AGRILIFE EXTENSION SERVICE
AGRICULTURE, COMMISSIONER OF
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
OLIVE OIL INDUSTRY ADVISORY BOARD, TEXAS
TEXAS A&M AGRILIFE EXTENSION SERVICE
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1514 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01514I.htm |