TX HB1514 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance to veterans of specially marked driver's licenses.
Title
Relating to the issuance to veterans of specially marked driver's licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Rep. Joe Farias [D] | Rep. Jason Isaac [R] | Rep. Kenneth Sheets [R] |
Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-19 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-12 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-12 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-06 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2011-03-02 | Read first time | |
2011-02-18 | Filed |