TX HB1514 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the definition of supplemental environmental projects.
Title
Relating to the definition of supplemental environmental projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-16 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time | |
2009-02-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1491 (Same As) 2009-04-07 - Left pending in committee