TX HB1507 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an entity responsible for the local share of qualified project costs under the ship channel improvement revolving fund.
Title
Relating to an entity responsible for the local share of qualified project costs under the ship channel improvement revolving fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1090 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
WATER
Water--Navigation & Ports
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
WATER
Water--Navigation & Ports