TX HB1505 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to attachments for broadband service on utility poles owned by an electric cooperative and establishing and funding a pole replacement program for deployment of certain broadband facilities.
Title
Relating to attachments for broadband service on utility poles owned by an electric cooperative and establishing and funding a pole replacement program for deployment of certain broadband facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Rep. Sam Harless [R] | Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1660 (Y: 128 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Amended RV#686 (Y: 138 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Amended RV#686 (Y: 138 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1660 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-04 | House | Record vote RV#686 |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-05-04 | House | Amended 2-Paddie |
2021-05-04 | House | Amended 1-Paddie |
2021-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-03 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 1-Paddie |
2021-05-03 | House | Amendment amended 2-Paddie |
2021-05-03 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Paddie |
2021-05-03 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-03 | House | Postponed |
2021-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1283 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
AUDITOR, STATE
BROADBAND NETWORKS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
Electronic Information Systems
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--Telecommunications
BROADBAND NETWORKS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
Electronic Information Systems
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--Telecommunications