TX HB1504 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Medical Board; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Medical Board; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1936 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#443 (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amendment as amended tabled RV#421 (Y: 100 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#420 (Y: 91 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amendment as amended tabled RV#419 (Y: 108 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amendment tabled RV#418 (Y: 111 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1936 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#443 (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amendment as amended tabled RV#421 (Y: 100 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#420 (Y: 91 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amendment as amended tabled RV#419 (Y: 108 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amendment tabled RV#418 (Y: 111 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-25 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2019-05-25 | House | Record vote RV#1936 |
2019-05-25 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-24 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-20 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-20 | House | House requests conference committee |
2019-05-20 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | House | Record vote RV#443 |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment withdrawn 8-Lucio |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#421 |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment as amended tabled 6-Cain |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment amended 7-Cain |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment(s) offered 6-Cain |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#420 |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 4-Toth |
2019-04-16 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment amended 5-Toth |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment(s) offered 4-Toth |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#419 |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment as amended tabled 2-Zedler |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment amended 3-Zedler |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment(s) offered 2-Zedler |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#418 |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment tabled 1-Zedler |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB610 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
ACUPUNCTURE EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICAL RADIOLOGIC TECHNOLOGY, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
RESPIRATORY CARE, TEXAS BOARD OF
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICAL RADIOLOGIC TECHNOLOGY, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
RESPIRATORY CARE, TEXAS BOARD OF
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills