TX HB1500 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the public school accountability system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the public school accountability system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1921 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#681 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-29HouseHouse adopts resolution for tech. correction
2017-05-29SenateSenate adopts resolution for tech. correction
2017-05-26SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-26HouseRecord vote
2017-05-26HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenatePassed
2017-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-25SenateLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-25SenatePostponed
2017-05-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25SenateAmended
2017-05-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25SenateAmended
2017-05-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-25SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-15SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Education
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-07HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-07HouseRead first time
2017-02-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback