TX HB1497 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring the disclosure of taxes and fees charged for the sale of concert and other event tickets.
Title
Relating to requiring the disclosure of taxes and fees charged for the sale of concert and other event tickets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2023-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed |