TX HB1494 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain municipalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Effective immediately
2017-06-01 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-22HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenatePassed
2017-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2017-05-08SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-04HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-27HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-20HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-20HouseMeeting cancelled
2017-04-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-20HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-03-20HouseRead first time
2017-02-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback