TX HB1490 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-30 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-30 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public school interventions for truancy and eliminating a criminal penalty and authorizing a civil penalty for truancy.
Title
Relating to public school interventions for truancy and eliminating a criminal penalty and authorizing a civil penalty for truancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-15 - House - HB 1490Third Reading House (Y: 116 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-29 | House | House requests conference committee |
2015-05-29 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted as amended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-15 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-15 | House | Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-14 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-14 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-14 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-14 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-13 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-13 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-11 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-11 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-05 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-10 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2015-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
TRUANCY
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
TRUANCY