TX HB1485 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to academic freedom for public school teachers providing science instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to academic freedom for public school teachers providing science instruction.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-14HouseReferred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair
2017-03-07HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-07HouseRead first time
2017-02-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback