TX HB1482 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the offense of hazing.
Title
Relating to the offense of hazing.
Sponsors
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] | Rep. John Frullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB38 (Same As) 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General