TX HB1477 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to performance and payment bonds for public work contracts on public property leased to a nongovernmental entity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to performance and payment bonds for public work contracts on public property leased to a nongovernmental entity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#754 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Vetoed by the Governor
2021-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenatePassed
2021-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-19SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-06SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-06SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#754
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-04HouseAmended 1-Rodriguez and Larson
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1014 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1477
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01477I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01477H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01477E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01477S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01477F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01477H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01477I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01477H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01477E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01477E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1477&RcdVtNo=754&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=140

Bill Comments

feedback