TX HB1474 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requirements for the designation of a property as a historic landmark and the inclusion of a property in a historic district by a municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requirements for the designation of a property as a historic landmark and the inclusion of a property in a historic district by a municipality.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-22HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1585 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback