TX HB1467 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to property owners' association annual meetings held electronically.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to property owners' association annual meetings held electronically.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1143 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1143
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback