TX HB1456 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the expiration of the health care provider participation program administered and operated by the Nueces County Hospital District.
Title
Relating to the expiration of the health care provider participation program administered and operated by the Nueces County Hospital District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1566 (Y: 110 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1566 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#582 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB273 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
NUECES COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Hospitals
NUECES COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital