TX HB1447 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of remote technology when conducting probate or guardianship proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of remote technology when conducting probate or guardianship proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#823 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#823
2021-05-06HousePassed
2021-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB759 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback