TX HB1442 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the release of certain defendants pending a motion for new trial or an appeal from a misdemeanor conviction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the release of certain defendants pending a motion for new trial or an appeal from a misdemeanor conviction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Passed (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#585 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-02HouseRecord vote
2017-05-02HousePassed
2017-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-01HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-28HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-02-28HouseRead first time
2017-02-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback