TX HB1433 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to the statute of limitations applicable to the collection of a contribution, a penalty, or interest under the Texas Unemployment Compensation Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the statute of limitations applicable to the collection of a contribution, a penalty, or interest under the Texas Unemployment Compensation Act.


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#243 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]


2017-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2017-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-18SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-18HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-17HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-12SenateRecord vote
2017-05-12SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-12SenateRecord vote
2017-05-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-12SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-12SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-04SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-04SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-19SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2017-04-19SenateRead first time
2017-04-18SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-13HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-13HouseRecord vote
2017-04-13HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-13HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-13HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-13HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-13HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-30HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-28HouseReferred to Economic & Small Business Development
2017-02-28HouseRead first time


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments