TX HB1431 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of sexual assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of sexual assault.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-28HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-02-28HouseRead first time
2017-02-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback