TX HB1426 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of a certificate of relief from collateral consequences to certain persons placed on community supervision, including deferred adjudication community supervision, for certain criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of a certificate of relief from collateral consequences to certain persons placed on community supervision, including deferred adjudication community supervision, for certain criminal offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1844 (Y: 119 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#645 (Y: 129 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25HouseRecord vote
2017-05-25HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenatePassed
2017-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-02HouseAmended
2017-05-02HouseVote reconsidered
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-01HouseReferred to Corrections
2017-03-01HouseRead first time
2017-02-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback