TX HB1423 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation and inspection procedures of certain long-term care facilities, including a survey of certain facilities' emergency power sources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation and inspection procedures of certain long-term care facilities, including a survey of certain facilities' emergency power sources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1589 (Y: 84 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - Amended RV#879 (Y: 101 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1589
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-24HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateAmended
2021-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Perry
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#879
2021-05-07HousePassed as amended
2021-05-07HouseAmended 1-E. Thompson
2021-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1423
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01423I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01423E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01423S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01423F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01423H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01423S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01423I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01423H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01423E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01423E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01423F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1423&RcdVtNo=879&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=27
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1423&RcdVtNo=1589&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback