TX HB1422 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Historical Commission.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Historical Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1348 (Y: 98 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#166 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#166 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | See remarks for effective date | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-10 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1348 |
2019-05-10 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-04 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-04 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Kolkhorst |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-05 | House | Record vote RV#166 |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-04 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2019-04-04 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-04 | House | Postponed 4/4/19 11:15 AM |
2019-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB605 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Historic Preservation & Museums
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Historic Preservation & Museums
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills