TX HB1422 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the restoration of expired eminent domain authority of certain rural rail transportation districts.
Title
Relating to the restoration of expired eminent domain authority of certain rural rail transportation districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - HB 1422Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-10 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2015-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-30 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2015-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Railroads
Transportation--Rural
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Railroads
Transportation--Rural