TX HB1410 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to payment for care provided by a chiropractor under certain health benefit plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to payment for care provided by a chiropractor under certain health benefit plans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2019-05-10HouseCompanion considered in lieu of SB 1739
2019-05-10HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-07HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2019-05-07HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseWithdrawn from calendar (by author)
2019-05-07HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1739 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - Sent to the Governor

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback