TX HB1407 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the carrying of a handgun by a license holder in a motor vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the carrying of a handgun by a license holder in a motor vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#248 (Y: 97 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#219 (Y: 89 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-20SenateRecord vote
2021-05-20SenatePassed
2021-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-20SenateRecord vote
2021-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-12SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-05-10SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-05SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-04SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-04SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-29SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-19SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-19SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-15HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#248
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-04-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-14HouseRecord vote RV#219
2021-04-14HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-14HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-A. Johnson
2021-04-14HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2, and Rule 11, Section 3; Article III, Section 35
2021-04-14HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-A. Johnson
2021-04-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1407
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01407I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01407E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01407S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01407F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01407H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01407I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01407H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01407E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01407E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1407&RcdVtNo=219&Ch=H&Dt=04/14/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1407&RcdVtNo=248&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-20-F.PDF#page=17

Bill Comments 750

feedback