TX HB1403 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of improper relationship between educator and student.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of improper relationship between educator and student.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2017-03-14HouseReferred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair
2017-02-28HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-02-28HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback