TX HB1401 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of money from the permanent fund for health-related programs to provide grants to nursing education programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of money from the permanent fund for health-related programs to provide grants to nursing education programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1143 (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Finance
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1143
2019-05-08HousePassed
2019-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback