TX HB140 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of the death penalty to a capital offense committed by a person with severe mental illness.
Title
Relating to the applicability of the death penalty to a capital offense committed by a person with severe mental illness.
Sponsors
Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. Sheryl Cole [D] | Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1163 (Y: 108 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1085 (Y: 87 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1085 (Y: 87 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1163 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | House | Record vote RV#1085 |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Capital Punishment
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Crimes--Capital Punishment
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Mental Health & Substance Abuse