TX HB14 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 83-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-14 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibiting certain transactions between a governmental entity and an abortion provider or affiliate of the provider.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibiting certain transactions between a governmental entity and an abortion provider or affiliate of the provider.

Sponsors

Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]
Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]
Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Tony Dale [R]
Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Gary Elkins [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]
Sen. Pat Fallon [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. Mark Keough [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]
Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]
Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]
Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]
Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. Paul Workman [R]
Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-07-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-07-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-07-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback